NH HB1385 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study animal welfare in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study animal welfare in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-25HouseExecutive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building303
2018-09-25House==RESCHEDULED== Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 10/09/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building303
2018-09-14HouseInterim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/19/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building302
2018-09-14HouseInterim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building305
2018-09-14HouseInterim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building303
2018-09-14House==CANCELLED== Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building303
2018-03-06HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 33
2018-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 18
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 303
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 9

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback