NH HB1382 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 9-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defining "farm stand."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defining "farm stand."

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-10-31HouseInterim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 9-2)
2014-09-16HouseExecutive Session: 10/21/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2014-08-26HouseInterim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 9/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2014-07-28HouseInterim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 8/26/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2014-06-04House==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 6/10/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2014-06-03HouseInterim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 6/10/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2014-05-13HouseInterim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 6/3/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2014-03-12HouseRefer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-02-24HouseCommittee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14
2014-02-17HouseExecutive Session: 2/20/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2014-02-05HousePublic Hearing: 2/11/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-12-16HouseIntroduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback