NH HB1381 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to required training on election procedures.
Title
Relative to required training on election procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 7 |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/05/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-27 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/05/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-14 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/20/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2024 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 |