NH HB138 | 2017 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Relative to persons held in civil contempt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relative to persons held in civil contempt.



2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-03-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. Hagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 16
2017-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0141h
2017-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-24HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2017 Legislative Office Building 208
2017-02-16HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-02-08House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-02-08HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-02-01House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2016-12-21HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources

Bill Comments