NH HB138 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 08/24/2013; Chapter 0116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 08/24/2013; Chapter 0116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting a political subdivision that has adopted the official ballot referendum form of meeting to use a topical description of the substance of a warrant article for the adoption of ordinances on the official ballot.
Title
Permitting a political subdivision that has adopted the official ballot referendum form of meeting to use a topical description of the substance of a warrant article for the adoption of ordinances on the official ballot.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Elaine Andrews-Ahearn [D] | Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] | Rep. Chris Muns [D] |
Rep. Frederick Rice [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 08/24/2013; Chapter 0116 |
2013-06-13 | House | Enrolled [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1648 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1222s(NT) (Rep Porter): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1464 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1222s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1222s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1222s, New Title, 4/18/13; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 3/20/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0059h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.331 |
2013-02-13 | House | Amendment #0059h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.331 |
2013-01-31 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0059h (New Title); House Calendar 13, PG.232 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0059h(NT) for Feb 13 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.210 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/24/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.184 |