NH HB1371 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing certain exemptions from permitting requirements for temporary seasonal docks.
Title
Repealing certain exemptions from permitting requirements for temporary seasonal docks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305 |
2018-03-06 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 53 |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 30 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-02-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 8 |