NH HB1370 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 07/01/2012; Chapter 0035
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 07/01/2012; Chapter 0035
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making technical changes to the New Hampshire real estate practice act.
Title
Making technical changes to the New Hampshire real estate practice act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 07/01/2012; Chapter 0035 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 11, Pg.383 | |
2012-04-11 | House Enrolled | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.350 | |
2012-04-05 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/11/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Hearing: 4/03/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7, Pg.186 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1289-1290 | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 7 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1057 | |
2012-02-16 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 ==If Necessary Continued 2/23/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302== | |
2012-02-09 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/16/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-01-31 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 2/9/2012 1:16 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-01-31 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/2/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-12-15 | House Public Hearing: 1/24/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 =Banking Div= | |
2011-11-21 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 7, PG.353 |