NH HB136 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying the equity jurisdiction of the judicial branch family division.
Title
Clarifying the equity jurisdiction of the judicial branch family division.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/11/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:10 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 192-161 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2017-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 9-6; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-02-01 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 18 |