NH HB136 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 54; Effective Date 8/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting tanning facilities from tanning persons under 18 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting tanning facilities from tanning persons under 18 years of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 199 N: 162 NV: 28 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Table (Y: 171 N: 188 NV: 30 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-03HouseSigned by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 54; Effective Date 8/1/2015
2015-05-13HouseEnrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1779
2015-05-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14
2015-04-30SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12
2015-04-30SenateSen. Kelly moved Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2015-04-30SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12
2015-04-17Senate=== RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19
2015-04-15Senate=== CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18
2015-03-19SenateHearing: 3/24/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14
2015-03-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8
2015-03-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-162; House Journal 22, PG. 588-592
2015-03-04HouseLay on Table (Rep Itse): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 171-188; House Journal 588-590
2015-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 4 (Vote 14-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 359
2015-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 2/17/2015 Legislative Office Building 205
2015-02-03HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/10/2015 9:10 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2015-01-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/3/2015 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2015-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 1/22/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305-307
2015-01-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs; House Journal 7, PG. 118

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback