NH HB136 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2280s(NT) (Rep C.McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1720
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2280s(NT) (Rep C.McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1720
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the uniform athlete agents act.
Title
Repealing the uniform athlete agents act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-09 - House - OTP (Y: 264 N: 103 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2280s(NT) (Rep C.McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1720 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 19, Pg.539 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2280s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 19, Pg.538 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Sen. Houde Floor Amendment #2011-2280s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.538 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Sen. Houde Moved to Suspend Rule 3-7 to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 2280s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.537 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment; Senate Journal 19, Pg.537 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Sen. Houde Withdrew Floor Amendment 2239s; Senate Journal 19, Pg.537 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Sen. Houde Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.537 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Sen. Boutin Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.526 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Sen. Houde Floor Amendment #2011-2239s, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 19, Pg.525 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment; Senate Journal 19, Pg.524 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Sen. Boutin Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.524 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Sen. Prescott Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.249 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Ought to Pass Not Voted On | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/31/11, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration | |
2011-02-09 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 264-103; House Journal 16, PG.319-321 | |
2011-01-26 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 9 (Vote 7-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 10, PG.150 | |
2011-01-13 | House Executive Session: 1/18/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-13 | House Public Hearing: 1/18/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 173 |