NH HB1358 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - House II. Remainder Effective 07/13/2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - House II. Remainder Effective 07/13/2010
Summary
Relative to the amendment of property tax inventories and tax lists by selectmen or assessors, and making a capital appropriation for the 12 Hills Avenue building in Concord.
Title
Relative to the amendment of property tax inventories and tax lists by selectmen or assessors, and making a capital appropriation for the 12 Hills Avenue building in Concord.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Walz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | House II. Remainder Effective 07/13/2010 | |
2010-07-15 | House I. Section 1 Effective 09/11/2010 | |
2010-07-15 | House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Chapter 0301 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-05-19 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1753s & #1835s(NT) (Rep Walz): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2227 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 17, Pg.399 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendments 1753s, 1835s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 17, Pg.395 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Sen. D’Allesandro Floor Amendment 1835s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.395 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment 1753s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.395 | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1753s, 5/5/10; Senate Calendar 18 | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Hearing: April 29, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11, Pg.262 | |
2010-03-03 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1092 | |
2010-02-17 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Day Beginning of Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 18, PG.1015 | |
2010-02-17 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 18, PG.927 | |
2010-02-10 | House Special Ordered to Regular Place in Feb 17 Consent Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783 | |
2010-02-10 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 16, PG.748 | |
2010-02-02 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 10 Consent Calendar (vote 13-0); House Calendar 13, PG.530 | |
2010-01-20 | House Executive Session: 1/28/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2010-01-13 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2009-12-29 | House ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 1/7/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Local and Regulated Revenues; House Journal 6, PG.237 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2367&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |