NH HB1349 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Hearing: 04/18/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Hearing: 04/18/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to generalized anxiety disorder as a qualifying condition for the therapeutic cannabis program.
Title
Relative to generalized anxiety disorder as a qualifying condition for the therapeutic cannabis program.
Sponsors
Rep. Heath Howard [D] | Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] | Rep. Alissandra Murray [D] | Rep. Jodi Newell [D] |
Rep. Christine Seibert [D] | Rep. Tom Mannion [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/18/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/21/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 9 |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 |