NH HB1347 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a house committee to study apportionment of state representative districts.
Title
Establishing a house committee to study apportionment of state representative districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 206 N: 121 NV: 20 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing: 4/9/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 3/13/2014 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |
2014-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0440h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-121 |
2014-02-19 | House | Adopt Amendment #0440h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0440h for Feb 19 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 11 |
2014-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/06/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308=CONTINUED= |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/30/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308=RECESSED= |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Election Law |