NH HB1342 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to live trapping of wild rabbits and hares by sporting clubs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to live trapping of wild rabbits and hares by sporting clubs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 44
2018-02-21HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 25
2018-02-21HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 307
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 1 P. 7

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback