NH HB1340 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - House Signed by the Governor 06/14/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0142
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - House Signed by the Governor 06/14/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0142
Summary
Relative to condominium liens for assessments.
Title
Relative to condominium liens for assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | House Signed by the Governor 06/14/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0142 | |
2010-05-19 | House Enrolled | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/12/10; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === May 4, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 8:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Hearing: May 4, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Labor and Consumer Protection; Senate Journal 11, Pg.262 | |
2010-03-03 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0658h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20 PG.1099-1100 | |
2010-03-03 | House Amendment #0658h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 20 PG.1099-1100 | |
2010-02-16 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0658h; House Calendar 17, PG.850-851 | |
2010-02-16 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0658h for Mar 3 Consent Calendar (Vote 18-0); House Calendar 17, PG.794 | |
2010-02-08 | House Executive Session: 2/11/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-02-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/11/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-27 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/4/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-26 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-11 | House Subcom Work Session: 1/26/2010 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 (Members: Reps Dowling, Keans, Kopka, Winters & Hunt) | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/7/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-06 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 6, PG.236 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2233&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |