NH HB1338 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 170-144 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 170-144 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the changes in law necessary to allow for microgrids in electricity supply.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the changes in law necessary to allow for microgrids in electricity supply.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 170-144 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 104 |
2018-02-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 46 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-01-30 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 02/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 7 |