NH HB1335 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 260; 06/24/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 260; 06/24/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the parole board and the procedure for medical parole of prisoners.
Title
Relative to the parole board and the procedure for medical parole of prisoners.
Sponsors
Rep. James Murphy [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 260; 06/24/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2102-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2102e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1551s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1551s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1551s, 04/21/2022; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2022-0811h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0811h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0811h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-02-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/04/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/25/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2022 01:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/04/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |