NH HB1333 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-21 - Executive Session: 10/17/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Hearing: Oct 17 @ 11:00 am in Legislative Office Building 306-308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-21 - Executive Session: 10/17/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Hearing: Oct 17 @ 11:00 am in Legislative Office Building 306-308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting state agencies from buying or leasing fleet electric vehicles for 10 years.
Title
Relative to prohibiting state agencies from buying or leasing fleet electric vehicles for 10 years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-21 | House | Executive Session: 10/17/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-08 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 9 |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 01/24/2024 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 House Calendar 2 |
2024-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 House Calendar 2 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 16 |