NH HB1322 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 177; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 177; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to risk-based capital for health maintenance organizations.
Title
Relative to risk-based capital for health maintenance organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 177; Eff. 8/7/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1812e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1812e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/20/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/13/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 2 |
2018-01-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 5 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-24 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 7 |