NH HB1321 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024; Chapter 193; eff. 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024; Chapter 193; eff. 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to repealing penalties for the sale of kegs of malt beverages without a receipt.
Title
Relative to repealing penalties for the sale of kegs of malt beverages without a receipt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024; Chapter 193; eff. 01/01/2025 |
2024-06-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0123h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 12 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-0123h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 12 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0123h 03/20/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2024 01:45 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 16 |