NH HB1321 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 190-93 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 190-93 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transportation of alcoholic beverages by a minor.
Title
Relative to transportation of alcoholic beverages by a minor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 190-93 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 77 |
2016-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0427h [^] House Calendar 14 P. 83 |
2016-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 12-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 83 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 10 |