NH HB132 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to net neutrality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to net neutrality.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 28
2019-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60
2019-03-07HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Abramson) 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 3
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 6
2019-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 38

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback