NH HB1319 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 176; Eff. 7/8/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting discrimination based on gender identity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting discrimination based on gender identity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - OTP (Y: 195 N: 129 NV: 30 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 152 N: 175 NV: 27 Abs: 38) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 176; Eff. 7/8/2018
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Reagan Moved Ought to Pass; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateRefer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 11Y-12N, Motion Failed; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-10SenateHearing: 04/16/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-07HouseReconsider HB 1319 (Rep. T. Smith): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 44
2018-03-07HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-129 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 40
2018-03-07HouseMinority Amendment # 2018-0680h (Rep. Sylvia): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 152-175 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 36
2018-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0680h (NT)
2018-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar)
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 208
2018-02-07House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 10:00 am State House Reps Hall
2018-01-11House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/31/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 6

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2009&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1319
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1022&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&v=SP&id=1022
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=110&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1319&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1319&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2009
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=111&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1319&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1319&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2009
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=210&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1319&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1319&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2009
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=211&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1319&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1319&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2009

Bill Comments

feedback