NH HB1318 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to sex offender registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sex offender registration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-27HouseDied on Table
2016-03-23HouseLay on Table (Rep. Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 48
2016-03-11HouseSpecial Order to calendar of 3/23/2016: Motion Adopted DV 275-25 By Necessary Two-Thirds Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 117
2016-03-09HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Spillane) 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 2
2016-03-03HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0819h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 13-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 6
2016-03-01HouseExecutive Session: 03/01/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2016-02-29House==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/01/2016 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2016-02-29House==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/29/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-02-29House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-02-10House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/17/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-02-10House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/01/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-02-10HouseIntroduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 10

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback