NH HB1313 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Executive Session: 02/25/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206
Pending: House State-federal Relations and Veterans Affairs Committee
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 10:30 am in Legislative Office Building 206
Hearing: Feb 26 @ 9:30 am in Legislative Office Building 206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declaring June 6 as D-Day Remembrance Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaring June 6 as D-Day Remembrance Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/25/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206
2020-01-21House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/19/2020 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2020 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback