NH HB1313 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2016; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2016; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to eligibility to vote and relative to availability of voter information.
Title
Relative to eligibility to vote and relative to availability of voter information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2016; Senate Journal 13 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/14/2016; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/30/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 78 |
2016-02-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 14 P. 47 |
2016-02-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 47 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building308 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 4 P. 10 |