NH HB1313 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 259-90; House Journal 28, PG.1674-1676
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 259-90; House Journal 28, PG.1674-1676
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing school districts to offer higher education scholarships to high school pupils.
Title
Allowing school districts to offer higher education scholarships to high school pupils.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - ITL (Y: 259 N: 90 NV: 24 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 259-90; House Journal 28, PG.1674-1676 | |
2012-02-17 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 21 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.1355 | |
2011-12-15 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-12-15 | House Public Hearing: 2/7/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-11-21 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Education; House Journal 7, PG.351 |