NH HB1310 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-31 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-31 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study health care for all residents of New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a commission to study health care for all residents of New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-31 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-04-13 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 04/19/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-10 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 132 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/09/2016 (Vote 10-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 55 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2016 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building205 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 9 |