NH HB131 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to renewal of health club memberships.
Title
Relative to renewal of health club memberships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 13 |
2015-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-09-01 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/12/2015 2:40 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2015 2:40 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/29/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 1/15/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 7, PG. 118 |