NH HB1308 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Full Committee Work Session: 01/25/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Pending: House Fish and Game and Marine Resources Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 9:00 am in Legislative Office Building 305-307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the capture, possession, and propagation of hares and rabbits for hunting dog training and field trials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the capture, possession, and propagation of hares and rabbits for hunting dog training and field trials.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/25/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2022-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 01/14/2022 2:45 p.m. Legislative Office Building305-307
2021-11-20HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback