NH HB1306 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the recitation of the Lord's prayer in public elementary schools.
Title
Relative to the recitation of the Lord's prayer in public elementary schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTP (Y: 196 N: 128 NV: 20 Abs: 52) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 196-128 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 24 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 47 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/25/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 17 |