NH HB1301 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Lay HB 1301 on Table (Rep. Hinch): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-127 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Lay HB 1301 on Table (Rep. Hinch): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-127 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Including the legislature as a public employer under the public employee labor relations act.
Title
Including the legislature as a public employer under the public employee labor relations act.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Mark King [D] | Rep. Sean Morrison [R] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Table (Y: 197 N: 127 NV: 31 Abs: 36) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Lay HB 1301 on Table (Rep. Hinch): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-127 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 43 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/22/2018 (Vote 6-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 20 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/10/2018 Legislative Office Building 104 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 6 |