NH HB1299 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 303; 08/30/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 303; 08/30/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the process for the importation of wildlife and creating an appeal process for denials of permits.
Title
Relative to the process for the importation of wildlife and creating an appeal process for denials of permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 303; 08/30/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2076h: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2076c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2022-2076c; 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/19/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-05-18 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/18/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Avard, Giuda, Watters; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1866s 2022-1752s and Requests CofC (Reps. Lang, Khan, Kittredge, Egan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1752s and 2022-1866s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Avard Floor Amendment # 2022-1866s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1752s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Remove HB 1299 from the Consent Calendar; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1752s, 05/05/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Hearing: 04/19/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0150h: Motion Adopted DV 183-155 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2022-0150h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2022-02-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0150h (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305--307 |
2022-01-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/25/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2022 1:30 p.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources |