NH HB1299 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to selectmen pro tem on state election day.
Title
Relative to selectmen pro tem on state election day.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Reed Panasiti [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] |
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 1 |
2020-03-11 | House | Special Order to first order of business on 3/12/2020 (Rep. Hoelzel): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 110 |
2020-02-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-02-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 51 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 17 |