NH HB1295 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/23/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/23/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring reports concerning school policies on classroom recordings and in-classroom observers.
Title
Requiring reports concerning school policies on classroom recordings and in-classroom observers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Interim Study Work Session: 06/23/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-15 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 01/27/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building205-207 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |