NH HB1290 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/05/2016; Chapter 66; Eff. 7/4/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/05/2016; Chapter 66; Eff. 7/4/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to filing dates for business taxes.
Title
Relative to filing dates for business taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 05/05/2016; Chapter 66; Eff. 7/4/2016 |
2016-04-28 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 53 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/28/2016); Senate Journal 16 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/14/2016; Senate Journal 13 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/14/2016; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2016, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0149h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 69 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amendment #2016-0149h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 69 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0149h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 44 |
2016-01-20 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building202 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 4 P. 9 |