NH HB1286 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to merging the board of land surveyors and the board of professional engineers.
Title
Relative to merging the board of land surveyors and the board of professional engineers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-19 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 15 |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/09/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 |