NH HB1286 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.746
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.746
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the installation of sprinklers.
Title
Relative to the installation of sprinklers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Paul Mirski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.746 | |
2012-01-19 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 1 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 4, PG.211 | |
2011-12-29 | House Public Hearing: 1/17/2012 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-11-21 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 7, PG.350 |