NH HB1285 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 174; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 174; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to dancers and entertainers in premises serving alcoholic beverages.
Title
Relative to dancers and entertainers in premises serving alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 174; Eff. 8/7/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/19/2018 Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0368h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 3 |
2018-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-0368h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 3 |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0368h (NT) for 02/22/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 4 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2018 11:35 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 5 |