NH HB128 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring pedestrians to obey signals at railroad grade crossings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring pedestrians to obey signals at railroad grade crossings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 6
2017-01-25HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/02/2017 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 6
2017-01-05HouseExecutive Session: 01/18/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2017-01-04HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2016-12-21HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback