NH HB128 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 221-140 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-06 - House - ITL (Y: 221 N: 140 NV: 14 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-06HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 221-140 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 53
2015-11-12HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 13
2015-09-29HouseExecutive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-09-01HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-03-03HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-20HouseExecutive Seesion: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-02-03HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-01-20HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 1/21/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2015-01-07HousePublic Hearing: 1/14/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-01-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 7, PG. 118

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback