NH HB128 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.
Title
Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 13 |
2015-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-09-01 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-03 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Seesion: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/21/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 7, PG. 118 |