NH HB128 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.764
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to recording public votes in public records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to recording public votes in public records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-13HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.764
2013-02-26HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 12-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.509
2013-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 2/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2013-02-12HousePublic Hearing: 2/19/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2013-01-30HouseReferred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 14, PG.236
2013-01-30HouseVacated from Judiciary (Rep M.Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 14, PG.236
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG.183

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback