NH HB128 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring tenants to execute a financial affidavit as part of the eviction process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring tenants to execute a financial affidavit as part of the eviction process.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-23 House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.461
2011-02-14 House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 23 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.270
2011-01-26 House Executive Session: 2/1/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2011-01-13 House Division I Work Session: 1/20/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2011-01-13 House Division I Work Session: 1/18/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2011-01-13 House Public Hearing: 1/18/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2011-01-07 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 172

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback