NH HB128 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-06 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.266

Summary

Relative to the enrollment of bills and their presentation by the secretary of state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the enrollment of bills and their presentation by the secretary of state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-06 House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.266
2009-11-25 House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 Consent Calendar (vote 10-0); House Calendar 2, PG.84
2009-11-16 House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/24/2009 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104
2009-10-21 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/17/2009 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 104
2009-10-20 House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/12/2009 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104
2009-10-20 House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/5/2009 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 104
2009-03-12 House Retained in Committee
2009-03-09 House Executive Session: 3/12/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104
2009-03-09 House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/9/2009 11:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104
2009-01-27 House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/4/2009 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104
2009-01-27 House Public Hearing: 2/3/2009 3:15 PM Legislative Office Building 104
2009-01-07 House Introduced 1/7/2009 and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 8, PG. 122

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback