NH HB1270 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a jury's determination as to the applicability of a law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a jury's determination as to the applicability of a law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 184 N: 145 NV: 44 Abs: 24) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
2016-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17
2016-04-14SenateHearing: 04/21/2016, Room 103, State House, 02:45 pm; Senate Calendar 15
2016-03-22SenateIntroduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10
2016-03-10HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0253h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-145 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 151
2016-03-10HouseAmendment #2016-0253h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 150
2016-02-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 14 P. 58
2016-02-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0253h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 58
2016-01-28House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2016-01-28House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/27/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2016-01-13HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building208
2016-02-10HouseIntroduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 8

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback