NH HB127 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 254; I. Sec. 1 & 2 Eff: 09/17/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the board of medicine and the medical review subcommittee and relative to health care workforce survey data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the board of medicine and the medical review subcommittee and relative to health care workforce survey data.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 254; I. Sec. 1 & 2 Eff: 09/17/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 07/01/2019
2019-06-27SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1775s (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted DV 251-94 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 4
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1775s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1775s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-01SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1775s, 05/15/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-16SenateHearing: 05/01/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0043h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 15
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0043h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 15
2019-02-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0043h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 7
2019-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 38

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback