NH HB127 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to identification of voters.
Title
Relative to identification of voters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 559 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 344 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 7, PG. 118 |