NH HB127 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - House Signed By Governor 05/15/2012; Effective 07/14/2012; Chapter 0065
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - House Signed By Governor 05/15/2012; Effective 07/14/2012; Chapter 0065
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of oral communication.
Title
Relative to the definition of oral communication.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Lars Christiansen [R] | Rep. Jennifer Coffey [R] | Rep. John Hikel [R] |
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | House Signed By Governor 05/15/2012; Effective 07/14/2012; Chapter 0065 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 13, Pg.474 | |
2012-04-25 | House Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.2211 | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.415 | |
2012-04-20 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/25/12; Senate Calendar 16A | |
2012-04-05 | Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === 4/12/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Hearing: 4/12/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5, Pg.121 | |
2012-01-04 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2702h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.373 | |
2012-01-04 | House Amendment #2702h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.373 | |
2011-10-25 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2702h; House Calendar 69, PG.2089 | |
2011-10-25 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2702h for Jan 4 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2201 | |
2011-10-05 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/20/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-10-05 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2011 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/5/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/27/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.823 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-03-02 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-02-16 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/22/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-02-10 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 2/15/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 (Orig 8:00 Amendment) | |
2011-02-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/8/2011 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-26 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-11 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-07 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 11, PG. 172 |