NH HB1264 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 133; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 133; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to carnival or amusement ride inspections.
Title
Relative to carnival or amusement ride inspections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 133; Eff. 1/1/2017 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1915e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 128 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1915e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/12/2016); Senate Journal 18 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/28/2016; Senate Calendar 16 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 04/20/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0640h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 5 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amendment #2016-0640h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 5 |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0640h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 8 |